CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LIBRARY AND INFORMATION PROFESSIONALS BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty, sickness and other kinds of suffering amongst librarian and information services workers and their dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 June 1967: Standard registration
- CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF INFORMATION AND LIBRARY PROFESSIONALS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- THE LIBRARY ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Vincent HonFCLIP | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
JOSEPHINE MARGARET WEBB MLib FCLIP | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Rosalie Sian King | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
David Stewart FCLIP, MBE | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Ayub Khan MBE | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Michael Osborn | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Stephanie Kenna Ms. | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Judith Clare Smith-Blow MA MCLIP | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.87k | £9.44k | £7.70k | £9.70k | £15.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.82k | £6.04k | £4.82k | £8.46k | £7.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST JULY 1964 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED MARCH 22ND 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AMONG MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE AND OF THE INSTITUTE OF INFORMATION SCIENTISTS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WISTERIA COTTAGE
NADDERWATER
EXETER
EX4 2JQ
- Phone:
- 01484866697
- Email:
- benevolentfund@cilip.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window