MADRESFIELD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 240291
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CHARITABLE DONATIONS IN MADRESFIELD AND NEWLAND

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £708
Total expenditure: £2,030

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 January 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES ANTHONY SOMMERVILLE Chair
None on record
Rebecca Hibell Trustee 10 January 2025
None on record
George Samuel Hopkins Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Rev Gary Paul Crellin Trustee 27 May 2018
THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF PHINEAS JACKSON
Received: On time
GUARLFORD AND MADRESFIELD WITH NEWLAND PCC
Recently registered
SIMON RICHARD CHARLES PATTERSON Trustee 08 June 2011
None on record
SARAH JANE TITMUSS Trustee 08 June 2011
None on record
CHARLES EDEN Trustee
WORCESTERSHIRE OUTDOOR EDUCATION DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION (WOEDA)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £525 £736 £695 £581 £708
Total expenditure £5.75k £575 £0 £400 £2.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Denefield House
Rectory Lane
Madresfield
MALVERN
Worcestershire
WR13 5AB
Phone:
01684572495
Website:

No information available