THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Norwich Diocesan Board of Finance Limited was set up to promote, facilitate and assist with the work of the Church of England for the advancement of the Christian faith in the Diocese of Norwich and elsewhere, providing resources for Ministry and Mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£13,046,000
Donations and legacies | £8.77m | |
Charitable activities | £788.00k | |
Other trading activities | £1.21m | |
Investments | £1.51m | |
Other | £767.00k |
Total expenditure:
£12,860,000
Raising funds | £728.00k | |
Charitable activities | £12.13m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,083,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £728.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.13m | |
Retained for future use | £186.00k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £728.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £12.13m | |
Retained for future use | £1.27m |
People

51 Employee(s)
21 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 November 1966: Standard registration
- 25 April 2022: Funds received from 1125111 GOOD WORK (NORFOLK AND WAVENEY INDUSTRIAL MISSION)...
- 25 October 2022: Funds received from 1187576 NORWICH SPEAR TRUST
- 23 November 2022: Funds received from 1077470 WEASENHAM PRE-SCHOOL
- 30 March 2023: Funds received from 1152589 TAS VALLEY CELL CHURCH
- DIOCESE OF NORWICH (Working name)
- DIOCESE OF NORWICH (Previous name)
- THE MRS R J COLMAN TRUST (Previous name)
- THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
21 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Jeffries | Chair | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Rt Revd Ian Bishop | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Catherine Howe | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Very Revd Andrew Braddock | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
The Ven Catherine Dobson | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Ven Keith James | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Mark Allbrook | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Paul Cracknell | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Stephen Thorp | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Virginia Edgecombe | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Matthew Price | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
The Rt Revd Dr Jane Steen | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Thompson Zulu | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Patricia Temple-Crowe | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Revd. Dr. Patrick Richmond | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rt Revd Graham Usher | Trustee | 17 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Kandara Rachelle KAMMOUN | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Susan Gail Martin | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Simon Stokes | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Angela Shireen Robson | Trustee | 21 October 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
The Ven STEVEN JAMES BETTS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.76m | £12.29m | £14.28m | £13.68m | £13.05m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.27m | £12.32m | £12.76m | £12.23m | £12.86m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £181.87k | £22.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.30m | £8.76m | £9.49m | £9.07m | £8.77m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £460.00k | £886.00k | £1.54m | £1.20m | £1.21m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £861.00k | £939.00k | £864.00k | £838.00k | £788.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.51m | £1.43m | £1.45m | £1.53m | £1.51m | |
|
Income - Other | £625.00k | £272.00k | £928.00k | £1.04m | £767.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £11.78m | £11.88m | £11.74m | £11.39m | £12.13m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £491.00k | £436.00k | £1.01m | £841.00k | £728.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £161.00k | £224.00k | £213.00k | £187.00k | £186.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £938.00k | £1.06m | £958.00k | £891.00k | £1.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £130.00k | £107.00k | £150.00k | £134.00k | £144.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £88.86m | £89.22m | £88.32m | £88.42m | £89.60m | |
|
Long-term investments | £56.91m | £55.98m | £58.14m | £64.61m | £65.73m | |
|
Other assets | £7.13m | £8.46m | £11.03m | £13.24m | £11.66m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.11m | -£614.00k | -£293.00k | £1.64m | £1.44m | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.79m | £5.37m | £5.63m | £5.67m | £5.21m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28/03/1906 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED ON 28/04/APRIL 1970 AND 5/05/1970 as amended on 19 Jun 2010
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND PROMOTE THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH AND ELSEWHERE (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM)
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF NORWICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIOCESAN HOUSE
109 DEREHAM ROAD
EASTON
NORWICH
NORFOLK
NR9 5ES
- Phone:
- 01603880853
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window