THE LINCOLN DIOCESAN TRUST AND BOARD OF FINANCE LTD

Charity number: 249355
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objectives of the Trust can be summarised as being to support the development of a growing, worshipping, celebrating, proclaiming Christian presence in each community of the Diocese and to support projects and enterprises consonant with that purpose.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire
  • North East Lincolnshire
  • North Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Mary Warrick Trustee 20 January 2025
None on record
Rev James Clabern Roundtree Trustee 11 January 2025
THE PHILIP LANK TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WULFRAM, GRANTHAM
Received: On time
The Very Revd Dr Simon Matthew Jones Trustee 24 September 2024
LINCOLN CATHEDRAL MUSIC FUND
Received: On time
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY OF LINCOLN
Recently registered
LINCOLN CATHEDRAL LEARNING, ARTS, CULTURE AND EVENTS CIO
Received: On time
James Drinnan Thom Tannock Trustee 27 April 2024
None on record
The Rt Revd Stephen David Conway Trustee 30 November 2023
CHARLES JOHN COOTE'S CHARITY
Received: On time
LINCOLN DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
Rev Julie Donn Trustee 18 November 2023
IMMINGHAM UNIT 560 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Received: On time
Revd Canon Dr Martyn Andrew Nicholas Taylor Trustee 18 November 2023
STAMFORD ST GEORGE'S CHURCH CHARITIES
Received: On time
STAMFORD ST GEORGE CHURCH ESTATE
Received: On time
SAINT GEORGE'S CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST GEORGE AND ST PAUL, STAMFORD
Received: On time
PAUL DAVID BREWSTER Trustee 03 May 2023
FRIENDS OF KIRKBY ON BAIN SCHOOL
Received: On time
KIRKBY ON BAIN PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND
Received: On time
LANGTON UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
LINCOLN DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
LEEKE CHURCH SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev Rachel Heskins Trustee 16 July 2022
None on record
Paul Davie Trustee 20 November 2021
None on record
RUTH BREWIN Trustee 25 September 2021
CHRISTIAN ACTION AND RESOURCE ENTERPRISE LTD
Received: On time
ST JAMES (GRIMSBY) DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Susan Barbara Elizabeth Watt Trustee 14 May 2021
ST. SWITHIN'S CHURCH LANDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF LINCOLN ST SWITHIN
Received: On time
ST SWITHIN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE
Received: On time
The Rt Revd Dr Nicholas Alan Chamberlain Trustee 05 December 2018
ST HILD COLLEGE
Received: On time
BISHOPS CHARITY FUND (LINCOLN)
Received: On time
David Cowell Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
The Rt Revd Dr David Eric Court Trustee 05 December 2018
BISHOPS CHARITY FUND (LINCOLN)
Received: On time
The Venerable Gavin John Kirk Trustee 05 December 2018
LINCOLNSHIRE CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
THE TINDALL TRUST FOR ORDINATION CANDIDATES
Received: On time
Rev Alyson Christina Buxton Trustee 05 December 2018
None on record
PROFESSOR MURIEL ANITA ROBINSON OBE Trustee 14 April 2018
None on record
Rev Justine Allain Chapman Trustee 21 December 2017
THE ERNIE WARRELL MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
David Thomas Wright Trustee 13 December 2016
None on record
Nigel Bacon Trustee 01 January 2016
OPEN SYNOD GROUP
Received: On time
THE EDENHAM REGIONAL HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST GUTHLAC, MARKET DEEPING
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.83m £9.20m £10.53m £10.93m £11.75m
Total expenditure £12.41m £12.02m £10.82m £10.79m £9.63m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £198.17k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.95m £5.25m £5.22m £6.27m £5.60m
Income - Other trading activities £493.00k £583.00k £684.00k £449.00k £446.00k
Income - Charitable activities £748.00k £653.00k £604.00k £575.00k £606.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £5.22m £0 £46.00k
Income - Investment £2.65m £2.28m £2.25m £2.32m £3.40m
Income - Other £983.00k £436.00k £1.78m £1.32m £3.46m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £306.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £12.15m £11.80m £10.51m £10.55m £9.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £263.00k £220.00k £304.00k £247.00k £316.00k
Expenditure - Governance £228.00k £184.00k £241.00k £229.00k £263.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £368.00k £866.00k £182.00k £237.00k £943.00k
Expenditure - Investment management £177.00k £0 £0 £0 £316.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £70.92m £71.62m £66.04m £63.28m £58.65m
Long-term investments £90.68m £87.88m £100.26m £105.58m £110.39m
Other assets £7.38m £5.93m £4.17m £4.85m £14.68m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£984.00k -£529.00k -£236.00k £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.45m £2.06m £720.00k £1.10m £694.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 23 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 26 JANUARY 1993
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF NEED AMONG STIPENDIARY CLERGY OR RETIRED CLERGY OR THE WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS OF CLERGY RESIDENT IN THE DIOCESE OF LINCOLN.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF LINCOLN
Registration history
  • 19 March 1993 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Edward King House
Minster Yard
LINCOLN
LN2 1PU
Phone:
01522504050