THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Mission & Ministry in the Parishes - paying clergy stipends incl pension contribs, providing & maintaining houses for clergy & training clergy & other parish officers. 2. Education - providing support for head teachers & governors, facilitating capital expenditure on schools & sponsoring certain schools with Academy status. 3.Contributions to NCIs 4. Provision of the Diocesan Retreat House
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£26,411,159
Donations and legacies | £21.05m | |
Charitable activities | £1.49m | |
Other trading activities | £807.69k | |
Investments | £2.06m | |
Other | £1.01m |
Total expenditure:
£24,645,062
Raising funds | £336.35k | |
Charitable activities | £24.31m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,576,169 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £336.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £24.31m | |
Retained for future use | £1.77m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £336.35k | |
Charitable expenditure | £24.31m | |
Retained for future use | £6.34m |
People

95 Employee(s)
27 Trustee(s)
247 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Southend-on-sea
- Suffolk
- Thurrock
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 13 October 1966: Standard registration
- 15 July 2018: Funds received from 1156942 THE JIGSAW PROJECT
- THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD (Working name)
- THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (Previous name)
- THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (Previous name)
- THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
27 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY STEPHEN PETER MUSHENS | Chair | 26 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev DAVID CHESNEY | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Adrian Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
JULIA THOMAS | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Vevet Deer | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
The Very Revd Dr Jessica Martin | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
The Ven Dr Susan Joyce Lucas | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Florence Conaty | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Revd Dr Christian Okeke | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Wilhelmina Joan Goulbourn | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Duraisamy Daniel Jebanesan | Trustee | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Kate Peacock | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||
The Ven Jonathan Croucher | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Right Reverend Adam Atkinson | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
HAZEL THOMAS | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Jill Elizabeth Readings | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Venerable Michael Power | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rt Revd Lynne Susan Cullens | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
John Goodwin Blackford Tipping | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Revd Canon Nicholas Edward Rowan | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
MARY CAROLINE DURLACHER | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Philip Carnelley | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Rt Revd Dr Gulnar Eleanor Francis-Dehqani | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|||||||||
The Venerable Christopher Mark Burke | Trustee | 12 May 2019 |
|
|||||||||
The Venerable Ruth Janet Patten | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Rt Rev Roger Anthony Brett Morris | Trustee | 25 July 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Canon ROBERT IAN HAMMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.11m | £23.02m | £24.84m | £23.75m | £26.41m | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.77m | £23.27m | £22.88m | £24.14m | £24.65m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £19.18m | £19.62m | £20.62m | £19.43m | £21.05m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £969.00k | £603.00k | £722.00k | £737.55k | £807.69k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.89m | £1.33m | £1.28m | £1.40m | £1.49m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.55m | £1.46m | £1.52m | £1.66m | £2.06m | |
|
Income - Other | £525.00k | £0 | £701.00k | £525.89k | £1.01m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £21.20m | £23.05m | £22.65m | £23.85m | £24.31m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £573.00k | £217.00k | £230.00k | £291.25k | £336.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £56.00k | £36.00k | £27.00k | £52.87k | £54.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.23m | £1.64m | £1.27m | £1.26m | £1.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £263.00k | £217.00k | £230.00k | £291.25k | £311.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £264.15m | £276.16m | £289.52m | £308.00m | £292.17m | |
|
Long-term investments | £55.55m | £53.32m | £64.38m | £65.00m | £69.86m | |
|
Other assets | £6.43m | £14.87m | £19.81m | £18.61m | £21.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.03m | -£184.00k | £21.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £17.80m | £18.87m | £17.28m | £15.70m | £10.71m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/07/1914 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/04/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/1979 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/03/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/06/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2012 as amended on 17 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND PROMOTE THE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 NEW STREET
CHELMSFORD
CM1 1AT
- Phone:
- 01245294400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window