RAMGARHIA SIKH GURDWARA EAST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and charitable activities activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 October 1989: Standard registration
- RAMGARHIA SIKH GURDWARA (TEMPLE) LONDON (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BALDEV SINGH SEHMBI | Chair | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tejpal Singh Ubhi | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ratnager Singh Panesar | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kewal Singh Panesar | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Satpal Singh Chana | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pawinder Singh Sabharwal | Trustee | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MAGHAR SINGH HUNJAN | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JODH SINGH JANDO | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMARJIT SINGH PHULL | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
SURJEET SINGH BHARJI | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GURDEV SINGH CHANA | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Singh Jandu | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|||||
HARVINDER SINGH VIRDEE | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Gurpal Singh Bhambhra | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HARDEV SINGH SIRA | Trustee | 21 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £255.56k | £306.91k | £106.22k | £237.42k | £381.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.80k | £247.94k | £200.64k | £191.99k | £257.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 122 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 122 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 246 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 December 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 31 December 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 11 January 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 11 January 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/04/1972 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1986 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/2012
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION IN PARTICULAR AMONG THE RAMGARHIA SIKH COMMUNITY IN EAST LONDON; (B) THE PREACHING OF SIKHISM AS CONTAINED IN THE DOCRINE OF THE HOLI SIRI GRANTH SAHIB; (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG THE RAMGARHIA SIKH COMMUNITY; AND (D) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE CUMMUNITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
EAST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10-16 NEVILLE ROAD
FOREST GATE
LONDON
E7 9QX
- Phone:
- 0205529494
- Email:
- rsgtemple@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window