MADRON (WAR MEMORIAL) NURSES' HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE ACTIVITY PRINCIPALLY FOR THE RESIDENTS OF MADRON PARISH
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 27 February 1974: Standard registration
- MADRON (WAR MEMORIAL) (Working name)
- NURSES HOME (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Jon Elliott | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY ANN JENKIN | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA LORAINE WILSON | Trustee | 06 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES RANDAL FRIGGENS | Trustee |
|
||||||
COLONEL SIR EDWARD BOLITHO OBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.62k | £6.12k | £7.75k | £13.21k | £10.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.51k | £0 | £0 | £3.23k | £12.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH JUNE 1952
Charitable objects
A. THE PROVISION OF A BUILDING SUITABLE FOR THE ACCOMODATION OF A NURSE OF NURSES INCLUDING A CLINIC. B. ANY OTHER OBJECTS OF A CHARITABLE NATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF MADRON AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MADRON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Seafields
PAIGNTON
TQ4 6NY
- Phone:
- 01803845918
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window