Young Gloucestershire Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young Gloucestershire (YG) is a countywide charity that supports disadvantaged young people (aged 11-25) who are facing challenges in their lives. YG?s vision is for young people to have the confidence motivation and skills to improve their lives. We work to achieve this vision by providing training, practical support and working with communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,146,840
Donations and legacies | £1.02m | |
Charitable activities | £2.10m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £25.33k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,872,268
Raising funds | £326.63k | |
Charitable activities | £2.55m | |
Other | £0 |
£35,037 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,850,975 from 13 government contract(s) and £11,639 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £326.63k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.55m | |
Retained for future use | £274.57k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £326.63k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.55m | |
Retained for future use | £309.61k |
People

84 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 27 March 1981: Standard registration
- 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
- YOUNG GLOUCESTERSHIRE (Working name)
- GLOUCESTERSHIRE YOUTH ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- YOUNG GLOUCESTERSHIRE (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valentine Mark Sheridan | Chair | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAMES TABOR | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE DANSON | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grant Leon | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Titterton | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Jane O'Donoghue | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Holroyd | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon McKeag | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frances Camille Stallard | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Moule | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78m | £2.03m | £2.68m | £2.32m | £3.15m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.74m | £1.50m | £2.14m | £2.29m | £2.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.21m | £901.59k | £1.40m | £1.39m | £1.85m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.56k | £79.00k | £170.69k | £11.64k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £50.39k | £1.11m | £822.71k | £597.96k | £1.02m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £27.36k | £24.95k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.70m | £890.62k | £1.83m | £1.71m | £2.10m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.77k | £2.84k | £2.58k | £6.25k | £25.33k | |
|
Income - Other | £30.35k | £0 | £4.07k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.61m | £1.37m | £1.94m | £2.04m | £2.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £128.17k | £135.03k | £196.60k | £242.80k | £326.63k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £7.64k | £12.63k | £941 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £27.50k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £28.33k | £1.13m | £1.17m | £1.21m | £1.25m | |
|
Long-term investments | £14.11k | £17.37k | £18.64k | £474.45k | £560.44k | |
|
Other assets | £1.25m | £1.40m | £2.01m | £1.51m | £1.84m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £403.30k | £1.13m | £1.24m | £1.21m | £1.35m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/02/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/07/2013 as amended on 24 Feb 1981
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) SHALL INCLUDE BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO,HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES OR TO PROVIDE SUCH OTHER HELP AND SUPPORT TO YOUNG PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE, HERITAGE OR SCIENCE, THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, AND SUCH OTHER PURPOSES RECOGNISED FROM TIME TO TIME BY LAW AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Dock Office
Commercial Road
Gloucester
GL1 2EB
- Phone:
- 01452501008
- Email:
- getinvolved@youngglos.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window