FORMER CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL (WEST SIDE OF MAIN ROAD) COLDEN COMMON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities for children and young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 August 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kirsti Louise Chapungu | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Baden Pearce | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|||||
DAVID MYRON SNOSWELL | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Damon Allan Draisey | Trustee | 12 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £980 | £1.03k | £690 | £523 | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £644 | £562 | £432 | £751 | £2.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 24TH DECEMBER 1910
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A PLACE OF MEETING FOR CONFERENCES OF THE CLERGY FOR DISTRICT VISITORS, FOR COMMITTEES OF ANY SOCIETY FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY RELIGIOUS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND FOR MEETINGS TO BE CALLED IN OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY SUCH CHARITABLE SOCIETIES OR FOR ANY OTHER OBJECTS ENDS OR PURPOSES HAVING IN VIEW THE SPIRITUAL OR INTELLECTUAL OR MORAL WANTS OF THE NEIGHBOURING POPULATION WHICH THE INCUMBENT MAY THINK PROPER (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF CONVEYANCE 24TH DECEMBER 1910).
Area of benefit
COLDEN COMMON
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 CLAMP GREEN
COLDEN COMMON
WINCHESTER
SO21 1UA
- Phone:
- 01962713442
- Email:
- anthony.wlsn@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window