THE STANSMORE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
It makes grants to organisations which are usually charities themselves, but not always so.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 19 March 1982: Standard registration
- PETER NUTTING CHARITY (Working name)
- THE PETER NUTTING CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ROBERT NUTTING JP DL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
CECILIA HESTER NUTTING MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.25k | £21.25k | £15.95k | £20.40k | £17.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.49k | £24.74k | £58.71k | £57.65k | £90.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH JANUARY 1982 as amended on 12 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND ALSO SO MUCH OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AS THE SETTLOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTION AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE SETTLOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY A LIKE NOTICE DIRECT AND SUBJECT TO AND IN DEFAULT OF ANY SUCH DIRECTION AND IN SO FAR AS SUCH DIRECTION MAY NOT EXTEND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY AT THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIELD HOUSE
BENTWORTH
ALTON
GU34 5RP
- Phone:
- 01420562703
- Email:
- pnut@uwclub.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window