THE SURREY CARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to tackle disadvantage, social exclusion and hardship in local communities and help people improve their life chances. We reach out to people to equip them with skills to improve their economic situation, to reduce their social isolation and to convince them that they have a valuable contribution to make to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£1,977,550
Donations and legacies | £489.06k | |
Charitable activities | £1.39m | |
Other trading activities | £44.19k | |
Investments | £51.69k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,797,264
Raising funds | £209.04k | |
Charitable activities | £1.59m | |
Other | £0 |
£30,381 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £409,057 from 3 government contract(s) and £651,778 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £209.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.59m | |
Retained for future use | £180.29k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £209.04k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.59m | |
Retained for future use | £210.67k |
People

58 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 November 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Cater | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Eleanor Payne | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Downes | Trustee | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD WHITTINGTON | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
MR R SEARLE | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
VIVIENNE WINTER STUART | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN CHAPLIN | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr NAOMI WINSTONE | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP OSBORNE | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|||||
KARI PRIDDEN | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32m | £1.63m | £1.90m | £1.87m | £1.98m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.24m | £1.53m | £1.76m | £1.76m | £1.80m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £436.01k | £219.18k | £219.18k | £223.73k | £409.06k | |
|
Income from government grants | £222.07k | £752.91k | £940.37k | £1.09m | £651.78k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £338.59k | £426.02k | £461.06k | £477.54k | £489.06k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £24.85k | £27.67k | £45.82k | £38.14k | £44.19k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £955.47k | £1.18m | £1.39m | £1.35m | £1.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £21 | £7 | £60 | £6.06k | £51.69k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £1.34m | £1.55m | £1.55m | £1.59m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £164.45k | £187.01k | £213.81k | £213.21k | £209.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.72k | £8.40k | £6.86k | £8.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £76.52k | £53.32k | £42.15k | £35.09k | £31.05k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £249.09k | £279.47k | |
|
Other assets | £595.74k | £734.38k | £933.25k | £783.03k | £956.36k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £341.16k | £382.55k | £437.36k | £418.00k | £437.39k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 29 OCTOBER 1984, 24 OCTOBER 1988, 17 MAY 1990, 4 OCTOBER 1999, 19 NOVEMBER 2002, 25 OCTOBER 2005, 10 OCTOBER 2007 AND 11 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF SOCIAL DEPRIVATION AMONG PERSONS DISPLAYING THE CONSEQUENCES OF ANY OF THE FACTORS SET OUT IN THIS CLAUSE 3 I) TO VIII) BELOW AND THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS (BEING IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUST THINKS FIT, INCLUDING, BUT NO LIMITED TO, TACKLING THE POSSIBLE CAUSES OF SOCIAL DEPRIVATION; (B) PROVIDING AND/OR PROMOTING EDUCATION AND/OR TRAINING AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE DISPLAYING THE CONSEQUENCES OF SOCIAL DEPRIVATION , THE FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS AND/OR THOSE PERSONS WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUST, ARE LIKELY TO BENEFIT FROM SUCH EDUCATION AND/OR TRAINING; (C) FURTHERING AND PROMOTING THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS AND METHODS OF RELIEVING SOCIAL DEPRIVATION; (D) OBTAINING AND MAKING RECORDS OF AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION CONCERNING THE SAME; AND (E) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY (I) THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE OR IMPROVEMENT OF A PUBLIC PARK ; OR (II) THE PROVISION OF SOME OTHER PUBLIC AMENITY IN THE VICINITY OF A LANDFILL SITE PROVIDED THAT ANY PUBLIC PARK OR PUBLIC AMENITY PROVIDED, MAINTAINED OR IMPROVED BY VIRTUE OF THIS CLAUSE SHALL NOT BE OPERATED FOR PROFIT.
Area of benefit
ADMIN BOUNDARY OF THE SURREY PROBATION AND AFTERCARE SERVICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Surrey Care Trust
Astolat FF12
Coniers Way
New Inn Lane
Burpham
Surrey
- Phone:
- 01483426990
- Email:
- info@surreycaretrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window