THE CALVIN AND ROSE G HOFFMAN MARLOWE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and encourage investigative research into the life and works of Christopher Marlowe and into the authorship of the poems and plays now commonly attributed to William Shakespeare with particular regard to the possibility that Christopher Marlowe wrote some or all of those poems and plays or made some inspirational creative or compositional contributions towards the authorship of them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 15 August 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Taylor FRSA | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.29k | £28.62k | £27.66k | £33.61k | £37.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.96k | £21.57k | £9.36k | £13.30k | £29.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 12 August 2021 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MAY 1984
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF SCHOLARLY AND INVESTIGATIVE RESEARCH INTO THE LIFE AND WORKS OF CHRISTOPHER MARLOWE AND INTO THE AUTHORSHIP OF THE POEMS AND PLAYS NOW COMMONLY ATTRIBUTED TO WILLIAM SHAKESPEARE WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO THE POSSIBILITY THAT CHRISTOPHER MARLOWE WROTE SOME OR ALL THE POEMS AND PLAYS OR MADE SOME INSPIRATIONAL, CREATIVE OR COMPOSITIONAL CONTRIBUTIONS TOWARDS THE AUTHORSHIP OF THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE KINGS SCHOOL
BURSARS OFFICE
25 THE PRECINCTS
CANTERBURY
CT1 2ES
- Phone:
- 01227595720
- Email:
- bursar@kings-school.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window