THE SUDAN CHURCH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 290607
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Association's object is to promote and maintain interest in and support for the Provinces of the Episcopal Church in Sudan (ECS) and South Sudan (ECSS). This is done by providing regular grants to the Provincial Offices and Bishops, by publishing a biannual "Sudan Church Review", by maintaining links through visits, and by advocating the cause of ECS and ECSS in the UK and America.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018

Total income: £125,581
Total expenditure: £112,264

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • South Sudan
  • Sudan

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 1984: Standard registration
  • 19 December 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 19 December 2019: Funds transferred to 1180881 THE CHURCH ASSOCIATION FOR SUDAN & SOUTH SUDAN
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SUDAN CHURCH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £92.32k £129.11k £155.30k £64.09k £125.58k
Total expenditure £107.13k £144.34k £82.27k £91.41k £112.26k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 May 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 May 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 24 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 24 June 2016 On Time