THE TREVOR OSBORNE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making charitable donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 April 1986: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR OSBORNE | Chair |
|
||||||
Daniel Robert Allen | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Claire Osborne-Burrows | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEREK PARKES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.45k | £424.73k | £53.07k | £64.78k | £84.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.33k | £43.71k | £79.57k | £79.82k | £71.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE 7TH APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Stables
Combe Hay
BATH
BA2 7EG
- Phone:
- 01225832302
- Email:
- tro@trevorosborneltd.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window