HESTIA HOUSING AND SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hestia delivers high quality & empowering housing, support, protection & care services in partnership with service users & local communities in 22 London boroughs. Hestia provides services to people with mental health needs, physical disability, substance misusers, offenders, women & children fleeing domestic abuse, older & young people, personal budget holders & other wider community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£54,249,820
Donations and legacies | £1.10m | |
Charitable activities | £52.23m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £301.94k | |
Other | £616.94k |
Total expenditure:
£52,430,584
Raising funds | £288.12k | |
Charitable activities | £52.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£331,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £31,024,644 from 61 government contract(s) and £2,375,918 from 17 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £288.12k | |
Charitable expenditure | £52.14m | |
Retained for future use | £1.82m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £288.12k | |
Charitable expenditure | £52.14m | |
Retained for future use | £2.15m |
People

714 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
656 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 July 1986: Standard registration
- 20 May 2015: Funds received from 1054898 WANDSWORTH WOMEN'S AID
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAME MOIRA GIBB | Chair | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessamy Rose Gould | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Romeo | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Geoffrey Rawlinson | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mariana Catalina Cernica | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ailsing Thompson | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Mark-Richards | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Sarsfield | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Meek | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Bowes Byatt | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Pritchard | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Zacharias | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.72m | £37.44m | £42.34m | £48.24m | £54.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.59m | £36.93m | £41.43m | £46.91m | £52.43m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £21.14m | £15.87m | £29.73m | £34.13m | £31.02m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.67m | £1.10m | £909.60k | £1.28m | £2.38m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £726.09k | £1.03m | £555.80k | £592.84k | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £30.77m | £36.21m | £41.60m | £47.41m | £52.23m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £225.05k | £207.26k | £178.04k | £236.41k | £301.94k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £616.94k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £275.00k | £6.23k | £1.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £31.09m | £36.67m | £41.05m | £46.70m | £52.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £288.00k | £251.22k | £375.51k | £205.03k | £288.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £115.68k | £138.30k | £153.51k | £154.13k | £178.85k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £51.06k | £50.82k | £52.11k | £53.40k | £53.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £211.44k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.54m | £2.50m | £3.04m | £3.00m | £2.95m | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.72m | £8.71m | £8.99m | £9.35m | £9.98m | |
|
Other assets | £6.92m | £9.16m | £11.06m | £13.33m | £14.84m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£36.00k | £374.00k | £654.00k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.40m | £5.24m | £6.54m | £7.99m | £7.94m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/05/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/05/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/01/2014 as amended on 05 Dec 2017 as amended on 03 Dec 2019 as amended on 07 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1.1. TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND CARE FOR INDIVIDUALS WHO SUFFER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, ARE AFFECTED BY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, ARE OFFENDERS OR AT RISK OF OFFENDING, ARE IN NEED DUE TO AGE OR YOUTH, ARE HOMELESS, SUFFER SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE (THE BENEFICIARIES); 1.2. TO PROVIDE HOUSING, HOUSING RELATED SUPPORT OR CARE FOR THE BENEFICIARIES SO THAT THEY CAN LIVE MORE INDEPENDENT LIVES AND FULFIL THEIR POTENTIAL IN THE COMMUNITY; AND 1.3. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hestia Housing and Support
Beaufort House
4th Floor
15 St Botolph Street
London
EC3A 7DT
- Phone:
- 02073783100
- Email:
- info@hestia.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window