UNITED CHRISTIAN BROADCASTERS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Non-denominational Christian media activities. Our vision is Changing Lives for Good by the power of God's Word.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£10,149,095
Donations and legacies | £9.78m | |
Charitable activities | £69.41k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £300.79k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,598,641
Raising funds | £854.38k | |
Charitable activities | £7.74m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £854.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.74m | |
Retained for future use | £1.55m |
People

97 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
8184 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 4 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 April 1988: Standard registration
- 10 February 2023: Funds received from 1154179 LIFE KEYS
- 16 February 2023: Funds received from 1055406 THE SANCTUARY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 11 October 2023: Funds received from 1178711 NORTH SHIELDS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- 19 December 2023: Funds received from 1106584 IDUMU OKAKE ASSOCIATION
- 05 January 2024: Funds received from 286488 THE INGLEBY CHARITABLE TRUST
- 01 February 2024: Funds received from 515572 JEZREEL NEW TESTAMENT CHURCH
- UCB EUROPE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev ALAN KEITH SCOTLAND | Chair | 27 June 2000 |
|
|||||||
Helen Yousaf | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Arthur Elliott | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Gerard McCrossan | Trustee | 18 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
REV David Edwards | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
Rev DIANA ALVEREY STACEY | Trustee | 13 October 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.44m | £9.58m | £9.57m | £9.54m | £10.15m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53m | £7.45m | £7.90m | £8.16m | £8.60m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £66.17k | £7.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.29m | £9.39m | £9.50m | £9.37m | £9.78m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £142.89k | £114.82k | £64.63k | £97.07k | £69.41k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.29k | £5.27k | £6.30k | £80.99k | £300.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £66.17k | £7.05k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £278.19k | £569.78k | £204.74k | £323.87k | £469.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.77m | £6.73m | £7.15m | £7.31m | £7.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £758.92k | £719.58k | £742.27k | £855.61k | £854.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.20k | £27.48k | £29.10k | £39.97k | £59.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £74.76k | £118.72k | £117.54k | £446.70k | £191.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.18m | £2.22m | £2.25m | £2.39m | £2.58m | |
|
Long-term investments | £312 | £312 | £312 | £312 | £312 | |
|
Other assets | £2.71m | £4.83m | £6.43m | £7.78m | £9.13m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £587.94k | £622.60k | £569.84k | £834.44k | £823.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 8 MARCH 1988, 15 OCTOBER 2001 AND 13 OCTOBER 2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 JUN 2016 as amended on 12 Feb 2020 as amended on 27 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION; AND C) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNITED CHRISTIAN BROADCASTERS
WESTPORT ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 4JF
- Phone:
- 01782 911000
- Email:
- ucb@ucb.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window