3RD SEVENOAKS SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 303437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

3rd Sevenoaks Scouts Group providing scouting activities for boys and girls.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £42,579
Total expenditure: £57,301

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • 3RD SEVENOAKS BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Williams Chair 30 June 2024
None on record
Simon John Phipps Trustee 30 June 2024
None on record
Robert Monton Trustee 30 June 2024
None on record
Ian Manuel Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
James Christopher Holman Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
ROBERT JAMES DOWNARD Trustee 05 July 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.34k £27.82k £42.60k £29.82k £42.58k
Total expenditure £17.43k £21.27k £28.18k £34.76k £57.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.05k £9.89k £1.04k £350

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3rd Sevenoaks Scouts Group
SEVENOAKS
Bradboune Vale Road
TN13 3DE
Phone:
01732 459168