VILLAGE HALL (CHILTHORNE DOMER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's aim is to provide a centre for social and recreational activities for the inhabitants of Chilthorne Domer and those who live in the immediate vicinity regardless of race, sex, age, colour, sexual orientation or physical or mental disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,900 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 24 January 1963: Standard registration
- CHILTHORNE DOMER VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA BOYCE | Chair | 27 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nolan Collins-Bent | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keith John Brownhill | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Timothy Godwin Brandt | Trustee | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
JILL COE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.05k | £12.92k | £5.89k | £12.92k | £15.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.06k | £8.41k | £12.69k | £12.21k | £17.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.90k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1952
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHILTHORNE DOMER AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINTIY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brambles
Main Street
Chilthorne Domer
YEOVIL
Somerset
BA22 8RD
- Phone:
- 01935840200
- Email:
- markostheimer@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.