Trustees 1ST/3RD BOOKHAM SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305772

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paulina Coll | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Leonard | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Felicity Louise Allen | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angus Fox | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Charles Diprose | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Duncan Crawford | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Hart | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Smith | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Neil Prentice | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Victoria Joyce Hoath | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Page | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Plowden | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hoath | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Emily Page | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE WHALE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAREN ANNE WHEELER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRIS HALLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF TRANTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.