CHEW'S FOUNDATION AT DUNSTABLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants and financial assistance for educational purposes to young people, within the Dunstable area, whose parents are in sympathy with the aims of the Church of England and other Christian churches. It is also responsible for the upkeep and maintenance of Chews House and the Old Library (now The Little Theatre).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 03 July 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUGH DAVID GARROD | Chair |
|
||||||||||
John Gurney | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Brennan | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jimmy Carroll | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev David John Middlebrook | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Kenson Gurney | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Shirley Deller | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Barry George | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Cllr John Chatterly | Trustee | 08 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Jacqueline Prince | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||||
Ann Sparrow | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DAVID JOHN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.48k | £36.00k | £24.08k | £35.57k | £52.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.35k | £18.26k | £44.97k | £46.94k | £38.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13TH OCTOBER 1910 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 10TH FEBRUARY 1954 as amended on 05 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
1. ASSISTANCE IN APPRENTICING (ONE QUARTER). 2. SCHOLARSHIPS AND OTHER AWARDS FOR BOYS AND GIRLS WHO ARE NOT DISSENTERS FROM THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGHS OF DUNSTABLE AND LUTON, RURAL DISTRICT OF LUTON AND THE PARISH OF EDLESBOROUGH.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
GROVE HOUSE
76 HIGH STREET NORTH
DUNSTABLE
BEDFORDSHIRE
LU6 1NF
- Phone:
- 01582660008
- Email:
- dunstablecharity@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window