THE KEEPERS AND GOVERNORS OF THE POSSESSIONS, REVENUES AND GOODS OF THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON, WITHIN THE TOWN OF HARROW-ON-THE-HILL

Charity Number: 310033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide education of all-round excellence which develops to the full each pupil's potential and life long interests to the benefit of the wider community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Harrow

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 September 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HARROW SCHOOL (Working name)
  • THE JOHN LYON SCHOOL (Working name)
  • THE KEEPERS AND GOVERNORS OF THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON (Previous name)
  • THE KEEPERS AND GOVERNORS OF THE POSSESSIONS, REVENUES AND GOODS OF THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON, WITHIN THE TOWN OF HARROW-ON-THE-HILL IN THE COUNTY OF MIDDLESEX (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Geoffrey Philip Eyton CBE FREng Chair 18 April 2016
None on record
Caroline Elizabeth Artis Trustee 25 November 2024
Support Through Court
Received: On time
PROSTATE CANCER UK
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF EORTC
Received: On time
PROSTATE ACTION
Received: On time
THE FOOTBALL LEAGUE (COMMUNITY) LIMITED
Received: On time
Stephanie Margaret Palmer Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Sally-Anne Huang Trustee 21 June 2024
None on record
James Christopher Seppala Trustee 25 November 2023
THE HARROW DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
MARK CLOUSTON WALLACE Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
Dr David Alexander Taylor Trustee 26 November 2022
None on record
LIAM JAMES HALLIGAN Trustee 01 September 2022
THE JOHN LYON SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Dr Shenila Vivek Rawal Trustee 19 March 2022
None on record
Neil James Enright Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Charles Hubert Gallagher Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Melvin Leon Mrowiec MA Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Professor Armand Jacob D'Angour PhD, ARCM Trustee 07 January 2019
None on record
Harriet Rachel Mould Trustee 03 September 2018
None on record
Sir Jonathan Richard Symonds Trustee 01 September 2018
THE JINJA EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
National Centre For Universities and Business
Received: On time
James Philip John Glover BA Trustee 01 September 2017
THE HARROW DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
Dr David James Payne Trustee 18 April 2017
None on record
ADAM DAVID HART LLB FRSA Trustee 01 September 2016
HARROW ASSOCIATION SPECIAL PURPOSES FUND
Received: On time
THE HARROW DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID JAMES CHRISTIAN FABER Trustee 18 April 2016
None on record
Andrew Butler QC Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
GILES WILLIAM JEREMY GOODFELLOW QC MA LLM Trustee 10 November 2012
THE JOHN LYON SCHOOL DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Received: On time
CHARLES GERALD THOROTON STONEHILL MA Trustee 31 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £60.41m £67.90m £74.16m £84.01m £87.76m
Total expenditure £54.75m £60.27m £69.06m £75.96m £85.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.70m £739.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.34m £10.15m £9.12m £10.02m £7.93m
Income - Other trading activities £5.32m £6.21m £8.27m £10.02m £11.31m
Income - Charitable activities £43.93m £48.17m £54.25m £60.72m £65.41m
Income - Endowments £885.00k £721.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.92m £2.35m £2.40m £3.25m £3.11m
Income - Other £1.90m £1.01m £120.00k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £50.00k £11.00k £1.56m £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £49.50m £54.53m £60.06m £66.32m £74.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.02m £1.52m £2.06m £2.04m £2.06m
Expenditure - Governance £77.00k £88.00k £93.00k £98.00k £83.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £23.00k £403.00k £687.00k £493.00k £649.00k
Expenditure - Other £4.23m £4.22m £6.95m £7.60m £8.19m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Own use assets £104.65m £117.14m £131.23m £154.91m £335.56m
Long-term investments £118.01m £175.40m £174.23m £157.70m £164.47k
Other assets £22.74m £21.03m £11.36m £13.68m £8.65m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£9.98m -£8.82m -£4.34m -£5.00m -£4.50m
Total liabilities £62.31m £113.11m £123.51m £124.96m £125.71m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 18 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1889 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 6 JULY 1988 (NOTE: A UNITING DIRECTION (MADE UNDER S96 (5) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993) AND DATED 25 AUGUST 2004 HAS ALSO BEEN MADE BUT NEITHER ALTERS NOR AMENDS THE SAID GD)
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SAID LAND, AND SUBJECT THERETO IN OR TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE USE BY THE PUPILS OF THE SAID SCHOOL AS THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
THE FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL OF JOHN LYON
Registration history
  • 16 September 2004 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Harrow School
The Bursary
5 High Street
HARROW
Middlesex
HA1 3HP
Phone:
020 8872 8000