TEWKESBURY EDUCATION TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The income from the assets is used to provide special benefits to Tewkesbury School and needy young people in the defined territory to support their education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 20 December 1962: Standard registration
- TEWKESBURY GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS (Previous name)
- TEWKESBURY SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
- TEWKESBURY SCHOOL TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Thompson | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Folkes | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Stringfellow | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Quinn | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN HAWKINS | Trustee | 24 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.86k | £26.63k | £27.66k | £28.02k | £28.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.02k | £22.03k | £13.40k | £11.28k | £8.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 19TH JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED BY (MODIFICATION) ORDER OF 15TH JANUARY 1981 AND 4TH MAY 1978 AS AMENDED ON 28 NOV 2018 AS AMENDED ON 28 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
NOT MORE THAN ONE-THIRD OF THE YEARLY INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR TEWKESBURY SCHOOL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE EDUCATION FUNDING AGENCY / DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND SUBJECT THERETO THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE SAID INCOME IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF TEWKESBURY OR IN ANY OF THE PARISHES OF ASHCHURCH RURAL, NORTHWAY, CHACELEY, DEERHURST, FORTHAMPTON LEIGH, TEDDINGTON, TWYNING, AND WHEATPIECES, ALL IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE, WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO IN THE OPINION OF THE GOVERNORS ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Willow Bank Road
Alderton
TEWKESBURY
Gloucestershire
United Kingdom
GL20 8NJ
- Phone:
- 01684292152
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window