IMAGO MUNDI

Charity number: 313345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Produces the bi-annual 'Imago Mundi: the International Journal for the History of Cartography'. It is also responsible for coordinating the biennial series of International Conferences in the History of Cartography. In general, its aim is to promote and extend interest in the academic history of cartography worldwide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,688
Total expenditure: £20,927

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • IMAGO MUNDI LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Wouter Bracke Chair 21 January 2022
None on record
Daniel Crouch Trustee 21 March 2022
None on record
Dr Alfred Charles Hiatt Trustee 21 February 2016
None on record
Thomas William Harper Trustee 21 February 2016
None on record
NICHOLAS ALAN MILLEA Trustee 21 February 2016
None on record
Christopher James Fleet Trustee 21 February 2016
None on record
Dr JAMES RICHARD AKERMAN Trustee 17 May 2012
None on record
Dr MARKUS GUENTHER HEINZ Trustee 17 May 2012
None on record
PROFESSOR IMRE JOSEF DEMHARDT Trustee 17 May 2012
None on record
Dr CARME MONTANER Trustee 17 May 2012
None on record
CATHERINE HOFMANN Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY PETER PAYNE Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR MATTHEW HENRY EDNEY Trustee
None on record
Dr MARY SPONBERG PEDLEY Trustee
None on record
PROF. ALEXEY VLADIMIROVICH POSTNIKOV Trustee
None on record
Peter Michael Barber Trustee
LAUDERDALE HOUSE SOCIETY LTD
Received: On time
J B HARLEY RESEARCH FELLOWSHIPS TRUST
Received: On time
MEMORIAL SCROLLS TRUST
Received: On time
PROF ROGER JAMES PETER KAIN Trustee
J B HARLEY RESEARCH FELLOWSHIPS TRUST
Received: On time
DR SARAH JACQUELINE TYACKE CB Trustee
HAKLUYT SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr ZSOLT TOROK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.41k £20.32k £19.24k £22.28k £21.69k
Total expenditure £19.23k £18.63k £19.35k £21.90k £20.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 April 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 April 2023 75 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On Time
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
31
Sandringham Road
London
London
UK
E10 6HJ
Phone:
07474613362