TANCRED'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313814
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of scholarships to graduate and undergraduate students studying medicine and theology at Christ's College and Gonville and Caius College, Cambridge and to student members of Lincoln's Inn taking the Bar Vocational Exam.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £23,051
Total expenditure: £26,764

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 1962: Standard registration
  • 07 September 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 07 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1137540 CHRIST'S COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CA...
  • 07 September 2021: Funds transferred to 1137536 GONVILLE AND CAIUS COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CA...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £61.33k £53.07k £79.60k £51.68k £23.05k
Total expenditure £59.90k £50.26k £78.07k £49.28k £26.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 04 May 2018 On Time