AFGHAN REFUGEE INFORMATION NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Afghanistan Society (the charity's working name) is an independent, apolitical and non-partisan group, open to all, which aims to showcase the richness of Afghan life and culture. It aims to raise awareness and promote dialogue by arranging and supporting events in the UK that bring together those with an interest in or experience of ongoing development and cultural matters in Afghanistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout London
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 13 November 1986: Standard registration
- ARIN (Working name)
- THE AFGHANISTAN SOCIETY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MS E WINTER | Chair |
|
||||||
Heidi Wagner | Trustee | 06 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ghulam Rasol Yalaqi | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mirwais Wardak | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marissa Virginia Quie | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kudsia Kaker | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHIRAZUDDIN SIDDIQI | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
Leslie Ann Charlotte Knott | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Rainer Bowden | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|||||
MR R ARGUILE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.33k | £1.73k | £2.41k | £574 | £4.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £749 | £2.26k | £1.28k | £3.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 April 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 20 OCTOBER 1986.
Charitable objects
(I) TH RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH AMONGST AFGHAN REFUGEES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND (II) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION CONCERNING THE COUNTRY AN PEOPLE OF AFGHANISTAN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 BURSTOCK ROAD
LONDON
SW15 2PW
- Phone:
- 02087884554
- Email:
- afghanistansociety@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window