GRAND PRIX TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For over 3 decades the Grand Prix Trust has provided support for Formula 1's unsung heroes helping team personnel to put their lives back on track when things go wrong. Our mission now is to broaden this support to the wider motorsport family and consider all the current and former employees, along with their immediate families, of the businesses that supply and work alongside the F1 industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 May 1987: Standard registration
- THE GRAND PRIX MECHANICS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karin Fink | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSS BRAWN | Trustee | 22 September 2017 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER BLISS | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Wheatley | Trustee | 28 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN HAMLYN | Trustee | 19 August 2014 |
|
|||||
MARK DAVID SMITH | Trustee | 19 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ALLEN | Trustee | 15 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK MICHAEL CHARLES HEAD | Trustee | 16 May 2000 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BRUNDLE | Trustee | 15 November 1996 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JAKEMAN | Trustee | 15 November 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £289.33k | £163.81k | £89.34k | £361.30k | £348.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £288.21k | £143.29k | £147.88k | £212.45k | £232.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 12 FEBRUARY 1987 AS AMENDED ON 3 FEBRUARY 2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG NECESSITOUS GRAND PRIX MECHANICS AND FORMER GRAND PRIX MECHANICS AND THE WIVES, WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS AND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 NEW STREET SQUARE
LONDON
EC4A 3AQ
- Phone:
- 02078422000
- Email:
- office@grandprixtrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window