WILD CAMEL PROTECTION FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Protection of critically endangered IUCN listed wild camel (Camelus ferus) in its unique desert habitat in China and Mongolia. Environmental education, public awareness in China and Mongolia, media, books, videos and talks for raising awareness of urgent environmental issues. Established breeding centre, Mongolia for wild camels. DNA shows wild camel, a separate species 700,000 years old
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- China
- Mongolia
Governance
- 17 March 1998: Standard registration
- WCPF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rory Alexander Hamilton Buchanan | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
James McGregor Woodrow | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
GERALD EDWARD KIDD | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Lucy Elizabeth Lytle | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
KATHRYN JANE RAE | Trustee | 01 January 1997 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.06k | £97.88k | £58.20k | £55.00k | £72.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.12k | £72.67k | £71.73k | £71.50k | £114.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 25 FEBRUARY 1998
Charitable objects
[1] TO ADVANCE THE STUDY PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION FROM EXTINCTION OF THE HIGHLY ENDANGERED WILD BACTRIAN CAMEL BOTH INTERNATIONALLY AND IN ITS NATURAL HABITAT IN CHINA AND MONGOLIA. [2] TO ADVANCE THE CONSERVATION OF THE GLOBALLY SIGNIFICANT ECO-SYSTEM AND ENDANGERED SPECIES THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A NATURE SANCTUARY. [3] TO ADVANCE THE PRESERVATION OF THE DESERT ECO-SYSTEM IN CHINA AND MONGOLIA. [4] TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF THE LOP NUR REGION AND OTHER AREAS WITHIN CHINA AND MONGOLIA IN ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Samels Court
London
W6 9TL
- Phone:
- 02087484882
- Email:
- harecamels@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window