FRIENDS OF STANLEY PALACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) To make available to the public & to protect & preserve for the benefit of the public the building known as Stanley Palace, which has special historic & architectural interest. B) And for general purposes of such charitable bodies or for such other purposes as shall be exclusively charitable as the trustees may from time to time decide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 22 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hugh Edwards | Chair | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Alen Henshaw | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Parton Whittingham | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|||||
Terence Joseph Rimmer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.08k | £17.58k | £14.53k | £6.73k | £13.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.86k | £22.50k | £13.49k | £8.24k | £20.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.31k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
(A) TO MAKE AVAILABLE FOR USE AND ENJOYMENT BY THE PUBLIC AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE BUILDING KNOWN AS STANLEY PALACE, WATERGATE STREET, CHESTER WHICH IS A BUILDING HAVING SPECIAL HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST; (B) AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDEE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of Stanley Palace
Stanley Palace
Watergate Street
Chester
CH1 2LF
- Phone:
- 01244 325586
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window