DITTON HERITAGE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects of the charity are to promote,and advance for public benefit ,an ongoing record of the historical development of Ditton and the wider community through the provision of original Victorian classroom facilities in the previously derelict Victorian school building in Ditton,Kent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 19 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY MULCUCK | Chair | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard George William Baker | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard Fury | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
SIMON WEBLEY | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|||||||||
David Stevens | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Thomas Kitchen | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Janice Mary Cordwell | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
MARALYN MULCUCK Retired | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.68k | £10.79k | £15.96k | £8.17k | £2.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £2.33k | £4.55k | £20.23k | £12.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, AND ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AN ONGOING RECORD OF THE HISTORICAL DEVELOPMENT OF DITTON AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHERE ORGANISATIONS, GROUPS AND INDIVIDUALS CAN PARTICIPATE IN EXPERIENCING THE HISTORICAL DEVELOPMENT OF THE COMMUNITY SINCE, AND INCLUDING, VICTORIAN TIMES
Area of benefit
DITTON AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
8a Bradbourne Lane
Ditton
Aylesford
ME20 6PA
- Phone:
- 01732 844195
- Email:
- mulcuck.anthony@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window