THE HACKFALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Safeguarding the future of Hackfall, an 18th century ''green garden''. The site contains listed structures and buildings. These are the concern of the Hackfall Trust, which was set up to forestall the likelihood of commercial development. Stakeholders came forward, namely the Landmark Trust, English Nature, two Local Authorities, and the Woodland Trust, which acquired a 999-year lease of Hackfall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Esmond James | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Victoria Ruth Vivian | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
MR M D ABRAHAMS CBE DL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||
THOMAS JAMES PONSONBY RAMSDEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.92k | £13.57k | £14.09k | £16.50k | £17.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.01k | £5.10k | £2.20k | £909 | £908 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 November 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATION 11 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE HISTORIC GARDENS, WOODLAND AND BUILDING SITUATED AT HACKFALL, GREWELTHORPE, NORTH YORKSHIRE AND ANY AMENITY OR OTHER LAND WHICH IS OF SCIENTIFIC, AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL OR SILVICUTURAL INTEREST AS SHALL BE VESTED IN THE COMPANY FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Sleningford Hall
Mickley
Ripon
HG4 3JD
- Phone:
- 01765635229
- Email:
- tom@lindrick.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window