THOMAS WIEDEMANN MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants from the Fund are available to assist with the costs of visits to universities, libraries, or museums in the UK, related to actual or planned research activities. Any student taking a taught or research postgraduate course related to the ancient Greek or Roman world at any university in the UK is eligible to apply. Travel, accommodation and subsistence costs are eligible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 March 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR STEPHEN JOHN HODKINSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Professor Catharine Harmon Edwards | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Esther Lucie Elisabeth Eidinow | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor JONATHAN RALPH WARBURG PRAG | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR ALAN HERBERT SOMMERSTEIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £0 | £0 | £7 | £259 | |
|
Total expenditure | £770 | £75 | £241 | £161 | £1.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 May 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 28 April 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 07/02/2002 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2012
Charitable objects
I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF POSTGRADUATE STUDENTS REGISTERED AT UNIVERSITIES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE ANCIENT WORLD BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ASSISTING SUCH STUDENTS WITH THE COST OF VISITING OTHER UNIVERSITIES OR LIBRARIES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM; (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF POSTGRADUATE STUDENTS REGISTERED AT UNIVERSITIES ELSEWHERE WITHIN THE EUROPEAN UNION IN THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE ACIENT WORLD BY ASSISTING SUCH STUDENTS WITH THE COST OF VISITING UNIVERSITIES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOMMM
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE WITHIN THE EUROPEAN UNION
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERTON COLLEGE
MERTON STREET
OXFORD
OX1 4JD
- Phone:
- 01865276281
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window