RONALD MCDONALD HOUSE BRISTOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation and support to families who have children receiving treatment in the Bristol Royal Hospital for Children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 25 March 2002: Standard registration
- 13 December 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 13 December 2022: Funds transferred to 802047 RONALD MCDONALD HOUSE CHARITIES (UK)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £200.13k | £186.42k | £242.63k | £242.63k | £200.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.21k | £244.41k | £279.92k | £282.70k | £244.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 07 November 2019 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 07 November 2019 | 7 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JANUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR CHILDREN BEING TREATED AT THE ROYAL BRISTOL HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES DURING PERIODS OF TREATMENT.
Area of benefit
CHILDREN BEING TREATED AT THE ROYAL BRISTOL HOSPITAL FOR SICK CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window