FAITH IN ACTION MERTON HOMELESSNESS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Faith In Action Merton Homelessness Project operates a Drop-In centre for street sleepers and the vulnerably housed, offering friendship, hot meals, showers, washing machine, fresh clothes and help with moving on. It also provides accommodation in a Winter NIght Shelter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £96,722 from 4 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
340 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Merton
Governance
- 12 December 2003: Standard registration
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1155031 MERTON VINEYARD CHURCH
- FAITH IN ACTION MERTON HOMELESSNESS PROJECT (Previous name)
- MERTON FAITH IN ACTION HOMELESSNESS PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard Eugene McAlister | Chair | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Laws | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Robert Bushaway | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bush | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
TALAT MALIK | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Caroline Ewart | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carol Susan Graves | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Robin Napier Goodchild | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Douglas | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barry Angel | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Rawes | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £193.28k | £215.15k | £122.57k | £199.74k | £258.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.51k | £168.26k | £175.22k | £214.65k | £291.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £34.69k | £96.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/01/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/09/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 MAR 2016 as amended on 19 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON AND ITS ENVIRONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION,ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS OR VULNERABLY HOUSED,SUFFERING FROM ADVERSE CIRCUMSTANCES AND IN NEED OF HELP IN ACQUIRING A SETTLED WAY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wimbledon Guild of Social Welfare
Guild House
30-32 Worple Road
LONDON
SW19 4EF
- Phone:
- 07843 280 419
- Email:
- team@mertonfaithinaction.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window