BIRKENHEAD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an independent, co-educational school which admits girls and boys from 3 months to 18 years. The School comprises of a Nursery, Pre-Prep, Prep and Senior elements (including 6th Form).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£12,484,010
Donations and legacies | £286.37k | |
Charitable activities | £11.67m | |
Other trading activities | £92.83k | |
Investments | £291.08k | |
Other | £148.35k |
Total expenditure:
£11,972,950
Raising funds | £298.51k | |
Charitable activities | £11.67m | |
Other | £0 |
-£172,361 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £161,990 from 12 government contract(s) and £254,351 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £298.51k | |
Charitable expenditure | £11.67m | |
Retained for future use | £511.06k |
People

167 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£70k to £80k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 14 August 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
dr Nicola Jayne Thorp MRCP, FRCR | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Julie Higginson OBE | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stuart Furniss | Trustee | 25 June 2018 |
|
|||||
David Pottinger | Trustee | 03 April 2017 |
|
|||||
MR M R CASHIN MA | Trustee | 20 June 2016 |
|
|||||
JUDITH GREENSMITH | Trustee | 07 September 2015 |
|
|||||
MR E N RICE FRICS | Trustee | 27 June 2011 |
|
|||||
MR A J CROSS LLB | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR W D C RUSHWORTH BA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.29m | £9.42m | £10.39m | £11.55m | £12.48m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.75m | £8.82m | £9.68m | £11.03m | £11.97m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £23.63k | £370.49k | £148.32k | £161.99k | |
|
Income from government grants | £313.87k | £486.74k | £50.64k | £271.84k | £254.35k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £66.65k | £48.80k | £127.60k | £127.83k | £286.37k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £52.26k | £63.69k | £41.31k | £79.36k | £92.83k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.86m | £8.89m | £9.92m | £11.05m | £11.67m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £182.66k | £181.40k | £187.12k | £205.05k | £291.08k | |
|
Income - Other | £128.76k | £235.91k | £116.02k | £94.00k | £148.35k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £11.00k | £0 | £76.96k | £0 | £14.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.64m | £8.71m | £9.57m | £10.88m | £11.67m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £110.86k | £108.71k | £105.79k | £148.50k | £298.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £65.82k | £63.23k | £57.60k | £58.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £32.34k | £37.72k | £37.59k | £39.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £11.07m | £11.12m | £11.42m | £12.85m | £12.79m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.99m | £5.37m | £6.36m | £5.81m | £7.09m | |
|
Other assets | £2.77m | £3.12m | £3.76m | £4.10m | £3.33m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£456.00k | -£411.00k | £5.00k | £327.00k | £866.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.69m | £2.58m | £2.82m | £3.21m | £3.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
A) THE ACQUISITION OF THE PROPERTY AND ASSETS OF THE BIRKENHEAD SCHOOL LIMITED, THE TRUST KNOWN AS THE MCALLESTER TRUST (CONSTITUTED BY TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOVEMBER 1952) AND THE TRUST KNOWN AS THE JUBILEE TRUST (CONSTITUTED BY TRUST DEED DATED 30 MARCH 1911) AND THE CARRYING ON, AS SUCCESSORS TO THE SAID COMPANY AND TRUSTS OF THEIR CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND THE ADOPTION AND DISCHARGE OF THEIR LIABILITIES AND ENGAGEMENTS. B) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (ACADEMIC, SOCIAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL) OF PUPILS ATTENDING THE BIRKENHEAD SCHOOL (INCLUDING THE BIRKENHEAD PREPARATORY SCHOOL) IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
58 BERESFORD ROAD
OXTON
WIRRAL
CH43 2JD
- Phone:
- 01516524014
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window