THE SPANISH AND PORTUGUESE SYNAGOGUE DOWER SOCIETIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a)Providing doweries to poor women, preference given to orphans b) Providing grants to women following birth c) Making grants to other persons or bodies who provide goods, services or facilities to those eligible for assistance
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SYLVIA GRAHAM | Chair | 03 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Anthony Dwek | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|||||
SHELIA GEWOLB | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Magnus | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.46k | £23.10k | £26.49k | £61.85k | £29.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.40k | £31.37k | £36.54k | £66.77k | £33.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 September 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 September 2023 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 07 AUG 2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO JEWISH WOMEN AND GIRLS LIVING IN THE UK WHO HAVE A CONNECTION WITH THE SEPHARDI COMMUNITY AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY:- (A) PROVIDING DOWRIES TO POOR WOMEN, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO ORPHANS. (B) PROVIDING GRANTS TO POOR WOMEN FOLLOWING CHILDBIRTH. 2. THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPANISH & PORTUGUESE SYNAGOGUE
2 ASHWORTH ROAD
LONDON
W9 1JY
- Phone:
- 02072892573
- Email:
- accounts@sephardi.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window