THE PRAYER BOOK SOCIETY

Charity Number: 1099295
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotes use and understanding of the Book of Common Prayer centrally to worship and doctrine of the Church of England (and other Anglican tradition Churches) and its use for regular worship including main Sunday services and occasional services e.g. Baptism, Confirmation, weddings, funerals. Works to ensure that all ordinands are familiar with it and to introduce it to children and young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £332,130
Total expenditure: £407,866

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 July 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRADLEY FRANCIS SMITH Chair 26 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALDINGBOURNE BARNHAM AND EASTERGATE
Received: On time
Rev Theresa Helena Nancy Kuin Lawton Trustee 11 September 2021
THE CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF THE HOLY TRINITY AND OF SAINT PETER AND SAINT PAUL AND OF SAINT SWITHUN OF WINCHESTER
Received: On time
Rev Rebecca Jane Swyer Trustee 23 February 2021
ST AUGUSTINE'S COLLEGE OF THEOLOGY LTD
Received: On time
Rev Adam Gaunt Trustee 26 September 2020
TOGETHER MIDDLESBROUGH AND CLEVELAND
Received: On time
MIDDLESBROUGH FOOTBALL CLUB FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Christopher Hancock Trustee 26 September 2020
None on record
Fiona Rosen Trustee 16 May 2020
THE PORTSMOUTH BRANCH OF THE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Received: On time
THE BRITISH REGION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ECUMENICAL FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
Jonathan David Riding Trustee 16 August 2019
None on record
Iain Richard Johnson Milne Trustee 08 September 2017
None on record
The Revd Dr Daniel Robert Newman Trustee 09 September 2016
None on record
Rev Stephen Edmonds Trustee 09 September 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WIMBLEDON
Received: On time
PAUL MEITNER Trustee 30 September 2011
THE LEVANTINE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH ALL SAINTS, SOUTH KENSINGTON
Received: 6 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £299.08k £210.03k £1.04m £235.35k £332.13k
Total expenditure £282.19k £230.31k £267.78k £362.62k £407.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £979.52k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £21.85k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £1.85k N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £32.61k N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £834.21k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £212.04k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £55.74k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £17.30k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £12.95k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1983, AS AMENDED 30 JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED 31 OCTOBER 1992 AND 18 JUNE 1994 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 24 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION (ACCORDING TO THE DOCTRINE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND OF OTHER CHURCHES IN THE ANGLICAN TRADITION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 02 July 2007 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE STUDIO
COPYHOLD FARM
LADY GROVE
GORING HEATH
READING
RG8 7RT
Phone:
01189842582