THE NATIONAL LOBSTER HATCHERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the concept of sustainability in fisheries and aquaculture and to improve the long term productivity of the lobster fishery for all, through an active stock enhancement programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cornwall
Governance
- 11 August 2004: Standard registration
- THE NATIONAL LOBSTER HATCHERY (Working name)
- THE PADSTOW LOBSTER HATCHERY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophie Bennett | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Ashworth | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Vlasto | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Creed Thompson | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
HELENE LOUISE JONES | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
AMIE JO FULTON | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joanna Henley | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Edward Robert Coode | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lord St Levan | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Robert David Clifford-Wing | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Edwin John DERRIMAN MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.88k | £364.11k | £424.07k | £494.92k | £498.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £421.31k | £326.75k | £423.46k | £478.29k | £470.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.14k | £16.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 February 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/03/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/05/2011
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE LOBSTER POPULATIONS AROUND THE CORNISH COAST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION OF THE LOBSTER POPULATIONS C) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SUSTAINABILITY OF LOBSTER FISHERIES.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NATIONAL LOBSTER HATCHERY
SOUTH QUAY
PADSTOW
PL28 8BL
- Phone:
- 01841533877
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window