Trustees THE COLLEGE OR HALL OF VALENCE MARY COMMONLY PEMBROKE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

72 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRIS SMITH Chair 01 September 2015
THE SIXTEEN
Received: On time
THE MAUDSLAY SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Matthew Sepehr Mahmoudi Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
Professor Constantine Yannelis Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Javier Antoran Cabiscol Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Alice Raw Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Eoin McKinney Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Lucy Weinert Trustee 30 April 2024
None on record
Angkur Jyoti Dipanka Shaikeea Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record
Narine Lalafaryan Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Carl Henrik Ek Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Kaoutar Ghilani Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Professor Thies Lindenthal Trustee 02 May 2023
None on record
Dr Daria Ezerova Trustee 24 January 2023
None on record
Dr Flavia Mancini Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Dr Lorenzo di-Michele Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Dr Zenon Toprakcioglu Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Professor Renaud Morieux Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Dr Steven Ward Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Robert John Mayhew Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Nicolo Crisafi Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record