THE ECUMENICAL MARIAN PILGRIMAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the Christian religion, more especially through pilgrimages to shrines dedicated to the Blessed Virgin Mary, on an ecumenical basis. To publish material relevant to this.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE REVD PREBENDARY NORMAN WALLWORK | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
REBECCA CLARE ST JOHN WHITE | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev RICHARD CLUTTERBUCK | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Ronald Crane | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
VERY REV STEPHEN PLATT | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Philip Peter Corbett | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Mark Woodruff | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
REV PHILLIP SWINGLER MA DD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MRS H BROCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19 | £1 | £1 | £135 | £7.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £825 | £131 | £96 | £138 | £7.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, MORE ESPECIALLY THROUGH PILGRIMAGES TO SHRINES DEDICATED TO THE BLESSED VIRGIN MARY IN BRITAIN AND ABROAD, ON AN ECUMENICAL BASIS INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): (A) TO WORK WITH OTHER AGENCIES IN THE PURSUIT OF THE FOREGOING (B) TO UNDERTAKE STUDY OR TO SUPPORT OTHERS WHO UNDERTAKE STUDY INTO THE MATTERS REFERRED TO IN THIS CLAUSE B (OBJECTS) (C) TO PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ABOUT AND TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AND DISCUSSION OF THE MATTERS REFERRED TO IN THIS CLAUSE B (OBJECTS).
Area of benefit
BRITAIN AND ABROAD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 MERINO GREEN
OAKRIDGE PARK
MILTON KEYNES
MK14 6FL
- Phone:
- 01908222232
- Email:
- cyrilwood@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window