LONDON JEWISH FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTION OF JEWISH LIFE IN LONDON AND TO PROVIDE A PLATFORM FOR ENGAGEMENT BETWEEN LONDON JEWRY AND THE GLA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 June 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Russell Marc Rich | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Anthony Ziff | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||
AMANDA BOWMAN | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Daniel Rosenberg | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Laura Marks | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Noeleen Cohen | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Deborah Barbara Cohen | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Marie van der Zyl | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Sophie Dunoff | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
David Mendoza-Wolfson | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £500 | £5.50k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.52k | £1.48k | £7.46k | £5.17k | £8.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH FAITH; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CUSTOMS OF THE JEWISH PEOPLE; (3) TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY AND GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN THE LONDON JEWISH COMMUNITY AND OTHER RELIGIOUS DENOMINATIONS AND ETHIC COMMUNITIES IN LONDON; (4) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN LONDON, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE METROPOLITAN POLICE, THE PROTECTION OF THE JEWISH PEOPLE AND THEIR PROPERTY FROM, AND THE PREVENTION OF, CRIMINAL ACTS; (5) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH FAITH WHO ARE IN NEED OR ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORT House
147 Arlington Road
LONDON
NW1 7ET
- Phone:
- 02074907774
- Email:
- info@ljf.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window