CONFLICT RESOLUTION EDUCATION IN SHEFFIELD SCHOOLS TRAINING

Charity number: 1116794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CRESST is dedicated to helping children and young people learn conflict resolution skills that can be used in their schools and communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £56,373
Total expenditure: £69,908

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley
  • Doncaster
  • Rotherham
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 November 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON WARNER Chair
None on record
Professor Ian Sabroe Trustee 12 April 2023
Asthma and Lung UK
Received: On time
Pirashanthie Vivekananda-Schmidt Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Laura Catherine Selby Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Alan Hurford Trustee 20 April 2021
None on record
Adrian Marc Hughes Trustee 26 January 2021
None on record
SHEILA BROADHEAD Trustee 10 March 2015
JOSEPH KAYE'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
MARGARET ANNE EDMONDS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £96.45k £72.75k £118.96k £60.32k £56.37k
Total expenditure £110.09k £94.07k £78.14k £77.04k £69.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.65k £12.24k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CRESST
Scotia Works
Leadmill Road
SHEFFIELD
S1 4SE
Phone:
01142412745