SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF MEDIEVAL LANGUAGES AND LITERATURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society promotes medieval studies by the support and publication of research in the area, making it available to a scholarly audience and the wider public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

17 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Louise Boyle | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Ann Burns | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Lynne Thomas | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christian Casey Sahner | Trustee | 14 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Katherine Bowden | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alastair James Minnis | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Gunn Allen | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr David George Rundle | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Nelson Judd Dunning | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Charles Mossman | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr JULIA CAROLINE WALWORTH | Trustee | 06 May 2017 |
|
|||||
PROF JOHN HINES | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr SETHINA CLAIRE WATSON | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
PROF CORINNE JANE SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF ANTHONY JOHN LAPPIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF SYLVIA HUOT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR KENNETH PATRICK CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.52k | £28.13k | £24.39k | £20.04k | £23.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.01k | £27.86k | £25.62k | £27.22k | £38.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE SOCIETY EXISTS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF RESEARCH IN MEDIEVAL LANGUAGES AND LITERATURE AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THAT RESEARCH TO THE SCHOLARLY COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER PUBLIC. 2. THE ACTIVITIES THROUGH WHICH THE SOCIETY PROMOTES ITS OBJECTS INCLUDE: (A) THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF RELEVANT RESEARCH IN ITS JOURNAL, MONOGRAPHS AND OTHER PUBLICATIONS, IN PRINT OR ELECTRONICALLY. (B) THE SPONSORSHIP OF LECTURES, CONFERENCES AND OTHER APPROPRIATE EVENTS. (C) THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF MEDIEVAL STUDIES BY GRADUATE STUDENTS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ESSAY PRIZE, BURSARIES AND OTHER APPROPRIATE INCENTIVES FOR SCHOLARSHIP THIS IS NOT AN EXHAUSTIVE LIST AND THE SOCIETY WILL DEVELOP OTHER INITIATIVES IN ACCORDANCE WITH ITS OBJECT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SSMLL
C/O HISTORY FACULTY
GEORGE STREET
OXFORD
OX1 2RL
- Phone:
- 01865 615000
- Email:
- ssmll@history.ox.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window