THE CHARTERED INSTITUTE FOR SECURITIES AND INVESTMENT

Charity number: 1132642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote for Public Benefit the advancement of knowledge in the field of securities and investments; to promote and develope ethical standards for practitioners in the field of securities and investments; to act as an authoritative body for the purpose of consultation and research in matters of education or public interest concerning investment in securities. See the list on the CISI website.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • China
  • India
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland
  • Singapore
  • Sri Lanka
  • United Arab Emirates

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 August 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Cole-Fontayn Chair 10 October 2018
None on record
Neil Atkinson Trustee 09 October 2024
None on record
Sushil Kumar Saluja Trustee 29 November 2023
HEART OF THE CITY OF LONDON LIMITED
Received: On time
THE BRITISH COUNCIL
Received: 56 days late
Ian Christopher Clark Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Kottage Don Nandika Buddhipala Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Catherine Sidony McGuinnes Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Amyr Rocha Lima Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Peter Derek Moores Trustee 15 October 2021
None on record
Robert Charles Hughes-Penney Trustee 19 October 2020
ST LAWRENCE JEWRY GUILD CHURCH COUNCIL
Received: On time
Jane Elizabeth Orde Valls CSK Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Graham Nicoll Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Clair Victoria Mills Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
Petros Florides Trustee 10 October 2019
None on record
RAVIKUMAR HAYAGREEVA PURANAM Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
Claire Michelle Perryman Trustee 17 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.22m £13.38m £17.03m £19.01m £19.22m
Total expenditure £15.72m £13.96m £17.32m £16.50m £18.28m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £15.75m £13.02m £15.83m £17.93m £17.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £199.56k £167.32k £144.55k £240.59k £504.29k
Income - Other £275.19k £194.68k £1.06m £843.32k £836.49k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £15.72m £13.96m £17.32m £16.50m £18.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £157.99k £131.78k £47.42k £0 £60.46k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £432.81k £285.16k £231.84k £272.72k £365.95k
Long-term investments £8.47m £10.18m £10.98m £10.66m £11.78m
Other assets £11.49m £11.90m £11.82m £14.14m £14.06m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £6.74m £7.71m £8.07m £7.98m £7.20m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 APRIL 1994, 4 JULY 1996, 1 JULY 1999, 13 DECEMBER 2001 AND 25 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE FIELD OF SECURITIES AND INVESTMENTS. 2) TO DEVELOP HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS FOR PRACTITIONERS IN SECURITIES AND INVESTMENTS AND TO PROMOTE SUCH STANDARDS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS. 3) TO ACT AS AN AUTHORITATIVE BODY FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONSULTATION AND RESEARCH IN MATTERS OF EDUCATIONAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST CONCERNING INVESTMENT IN SECURITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 04 August 2010 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
20 FENCHURCH STREET
LONDON
EC3M 3BY
Phone:
02076450603
Email:
info@cisi.org