WHY ME? UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Why me? Transforming Lives through Restorative Justice
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David John Munro | Chair | 13 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Marianne Helen Helps | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Emma Jones | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Timothy Chapman | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Ben Andrew | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Julia Dawson | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Brian Neale | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Will Jacks | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Matthew Pink | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £241.77k | £344.14k | £377.00k | £415.71k | £272.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.44k | £291.65k | £457.00k | £355.06k | £290.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £36.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.76k | N/A | N/A | £36.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 AUGUST AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 JUNE 2010 REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 6 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
1A TO RELIEVE DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE VICTIMS OF CRIME ('THE VICTIMS') AND PERSONS AFFECTED BY CRIME INCLUDING FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF SUCH PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED 1B TO ADVANCE PUBLIC AWARENESS BY RESEARCH INTO ISSUES RELATING TO VICTIMS OF CRIME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND FRIENDS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3Space International House
6 Canterbury Crescent
London
SW9 7QD
- Phone:
- 020 45911970
- Email:
- info@why-me.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window