THE BROWNHILLS AND WILLENHALL METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Acts as an umbrella body for 10 churches . Plays a part in the stationing of ministers. Provides a preaching plan for all church services. Ensures that the Safeguarding Policy of the Methodist Church is carried out and obtains the required checks. Arranges occasional joint acts of worship and events for the Circuit's churches. Provides shared resources for worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

45 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
45 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Elizabeth Drayton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Diana Louise Bolton | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Deacon Helen Mary Webster | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Wendy Elaine Hawkins | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Haynes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl John Bolton | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Anthony Cronogue | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BOWDLER WILDE | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Jeremy Robert Hawkins | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
MARJORIE JUKES | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
FREDA ISOBEL WOODWARD | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT ALAN WHITEHOUSE | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
BOB SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA BRADBURY | Trustee | 16 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE JUNE EDMUNDS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Steven Brian Butler | Trustee | 14 February 2015 |
|
|||||
DYLYS BRADBURY | Trustee | 14 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SMITH | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
BERYL THORNLEY | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Howells | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|||||
MAUREEN CHRISTINE ALLCOCK | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANE KATHLEEN SARGEANT | Trustee | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN HARRY WOOTTON | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL STUART SMITH | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LIZI BIRD | Trustee | 16 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE HEWLITT | Trustee | 27 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ONIONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA C BRYAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN LOWBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BETTY ASHBURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEVILLE JOSEPH TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA BARBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANN MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE BRENDA CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID JOHN PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDNA MAY STOCKALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN ELAINE NEWELL-PEDLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Keith Walton | Trustee |
|
||||||
GLEN POOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
REV PAT HORTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANGELA NEWEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JACKIE WHITEHOUSE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.99k | £237.91k | £250.20k | £234.75k | £174.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £268.71k | £280.03k | £253.51k | £285.21k | £221.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND THE METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Victoria Avenue
Bloxwich
Walsall
WS3 3HS
- Phone:
- 01922475083
- Email:
- jhawkins@god-is.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window