WEST NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity number: 1136177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

West Norfolk Methodist Circuit offers opportunity for Christian worship and service in its 21 churches. It also makes its services available for baptisms, wedding and funerals as well as providing pastoral care. Several volunteers within the Methodist Church are Lay Preachers and many other volunteers take on roles to promote the religious ethos of the charity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £221,275
Total expenditure: £298,630

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

42 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul Critchley Chair 01 September 2020
None on record
Timothy Chaloner MA Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Rev Richman Ncube PhD Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Janice MacQuade Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
JOAN GREENING Trustee 01 September 2019
ST. FAITH'S CHURCH, GAYWOOD, KING'S LYNN SINGLE CONGREGATION LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Elizabeth MacLeod MA MCILIP Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Elspeth Hardy RGN DipICN Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Lesley Evans BSc PGCE Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Elinor Gudgeon Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Mike Wilkinson BA Hons Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Rev Jacqueline Goddard Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Lynne Tonge BTh Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Stephanie Howard Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Sheila Johnson BA BSc QTS Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
LESLEY DENT Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
RALPH MICHAEL PERKINS Trustee 17 May 2013
DOWNHAM MARKET METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
JOAN CARELESS Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
Andrew John Hiles Trustee 17 May 2013
ST. FAITH'S CHURCH, GAYWOOD, KING'S LYNN SINGLE CONGREGATION LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
KINGS LYNN FESTIVAL CHORUS
Received: On time
WEST NORFOLK GILBERT AND SULLIVAN OPERATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
DAVID SCOTNEY Trustee 17 May 2013
ROTARY CLUB OF HUNSTANTON AND DISTRICT TRUST FUND
Received: On time
HEATHER TITCOMB Trustee 17 May 2013
DERSINGHAM CHOIR
Recently registered
MARY ROSE Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
PHILIP JULIAN BATSTONE Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
PAULINE SCOTNEY Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
JEAN HARRINGTON Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
JEAN DENNETT BSC Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
STEPHEN HARRINGTON Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
TERRY MARTIN Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
VALERIE SHACKCLOTH Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
MAUREEN HIBLING Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
JOHN DAVIS Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
ELIZABETH BATSTONE Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
GLENYS REED Trustee 17 May 2013
None on record
RUTH HANNAY Trustee
None on record
PETER ALBERT MASON Trustee
None on record
PAULINE ANN DRIVER Trustee
None on record
MR D DENT Trustee
None on record
GILL ALLEN Trustee
None on record
CLIFF SHELTON Trustee
None on record
JOHN ROSPOPA Trustee
NORTH WEST NORFOLK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: 45 days late
MRS VYSE Trustee
ST. FAITH'S CHURCH, GAYWOOD, KING'S LYNN SINGLE CONGREGATION LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
MRS MAGGIE BLOWERS Trustee
None on record
JANET EILEEN MASON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £501.49k £180.20k £216.45k £219.24k £221.28k
Total expenditure £317.80k £286.47k £224.40k £368.52k £298.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £501.49k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £88.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £65.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £228.87k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 03 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 10 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 October 2020 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 07 October 2020 99 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Camomile Close
DOWNHAM MARKET
Norfolk
PE38 9UJ
Phone:
01366 388 766