LOUGHTON METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Methodist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 20 November 2008: Previously excepted registration
- LMC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sue Creighton | Chair | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Heather | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hay | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Maule | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Murray | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Donoghue | Trustee | 09 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Robert Davies | Trustee | 05 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Heather | Trustee | 17 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Lesley Moles | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Martin Howarth | Trustee | 01 May 1985 |
|
|
||||
JILL WINIFRED ANGOLD-STEPHENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN PERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David John Hobbs | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY KATE KNAPMAN BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER FREDERICK MOLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr Keith Aldred PHD, CPFA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.70k | £253.70k | £249.78k | £245.46k | £265.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.74k | £251.85k | £288.68k | £259.74k | £291.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
LOUGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOUGHTON METHODIST CHURCH
260 HIGH ROAD
LOUGHTON
IG10 1RB
- Phone:
- 02085023071
- Website:
-
loughtonmethodist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.