LEICESTER TRINITY METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CIRCUIT SUPERINTENDS THE WORK OF 18 METHODIST CHURCHES , TWO ARE LEPS: ONE IS SHARED WITH ANGLICANS, THE OTHER WITH BAPTISTS. ANOTHER OF OUR CHURCHES IS SIGNED UP TO AN AREA LEP WITH BOTH ANGLICAN AND URC CHURCHES. A FURTHER CHURCH HOSTS A MORAVIAN CONGREGATION. THE CIRCUIT COMPRISES CITY CENTRE, INNER CITY AREAS , OUTER SUBURBS, OUTLYING TOWNS, AND VILLAGES TO THE NORTH, SOUTH AND EAST.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

68 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 02 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
68 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maxilyn Dawn Geary | Trustee | 24 March 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Ivan Norman Bennett | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Nyarko Andam | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Andrew Stuart Farrington | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Kim Leslie Alexander Dip Theol | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Margaret Ada Edwards | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Sheila Hearn | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Ian Paul Chapman | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Whillis | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
MARY LYNN MOORE | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Mary Downs | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Laurane Webb | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Eunice Koroma | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Elizabeth Jane Dunn | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Garner | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Trevor John Solway | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew James Curry | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
NEIL ANTHONY CRUTCHLEY | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Liam Dacre-Davis | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Deacon Sharon Dilley | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Richard Cawthorn RGNRSCNMsc | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Kathryn Anne Cook | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Alan Talbot | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Sandra Amey | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Claire Orton | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Graham Tomkinson Msc | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Pauline Bott | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Elliott | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Ann Lowther BSc PGCE | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|||||||||
Barry David Victor Hillyard | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jennifer Ruth Gilbert | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Jo May Kay | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Kevin Weston | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Cecily Dorothy Ruth Findley | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
June Rosemarie Murray | Trustee | 18 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Diane Joan Price | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
BARBARA CHRISTINE BELL | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Pedzisai Grace Katsande | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Edward Holt | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Derek McLean | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Howard Ernest Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Wainwright | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Susan Wheeler | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
CHRISTINE HALL | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Stephen Martin Thompson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Patricia Myfanwy Mary Bryceland | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
David Frost | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Julie Manning | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Joan Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Sheila Ann McGowan | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Anthony Pick | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Brian Pearson | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Carole Jordan | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Wilson | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Trevor Robert Mildred | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr FRANK LAWRENCE WHITTAKER | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosalind Vernon | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Mr Tony Moore | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|||||||||
Rev Gordon Webb | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
JEAN MARY THORNTON SRN SCM | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
PETER JAMES HENRY SERCOMBE | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
VALERIE KENNING | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
CASHITA CHARLES | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
CHARLES PETER HOLDRIDGE | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|||||||||
BARBARA MARY GILL BA | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|||||||||
JENNIFER ANNE WESTON | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
Christopher Henry Whitford | Trustee | 21 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
MARTIN GORDON BRIERS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £574.83k | £433.03k | £452.98k | £455.87k | £496.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £468.94k | £396.60k | £450.27k | £485.88k | £532.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £434.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £24.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £93.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £441.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £240 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £9.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £27.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Linden Avenue
Countesthorpe
LEICESTER
LE8 5PG
- Phone:
- 01162872867
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window