ST. PETER'S METHODIST CHURCH CANTERBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Normal church activities and community outreach
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

22 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 16 February 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. PETERS METHODIST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oliver Azubuike Enwonwu | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Glen Sharman | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Everingham | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Danny Wheadon | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Bentham | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Nii-Ashie Hammond | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jennifer Karen Walters | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth Prince | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Marylin Lucy Bryan | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bell | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Doreen Margaret Rosman | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Philip Wells | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev MICHAEL JOHN WALLING | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|||||
Judith Margaret Eldridge ALCM | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Cockell | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN MARGARET BUTLER | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER CLARA DEVENISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL MERRYWEST BA HONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KAYE MARGARET MERRYWEST | Trustee |
|
||||||
Helen Louise Brown | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAWN CAROLYN IRONS MA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Wendy Irons | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.18k | £129.92k | £142.17k | £145.87k | £174.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.52k | £137.51k | £134.15k | £137.39k | £155.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 July 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 July 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 July 2020 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the dicipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Methodist Church
St. Peters Street
Canterbury
CT1 2BE
- Phone:
- 01227 459449
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window