THE METHODIST CHURCH NOTTINGHAM SOUTH CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Encouraging churches to:a)Provide regular acts of worship b)Provide sacred space for prayer and contemplation c)Teach Christianity through sermons,courses and small groups d)Undertake pastoral work e)Promote Christianity through staging of events and services f)Provide youth clubs, women's meetings etc with a Christian ethos g)Support other charities in UK and overseas financially and with prayer
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

37 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
37 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Mark Douglas Roberts | Chair | 12 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
Richard Andrew Sanderson | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Claudia Warner | Trustee | 23 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rachael Glover | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stephany Fogg | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|||||||
Pamela Mary Lerwill | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Iselyn Creselma Warner | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Nichola Grace Jones | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN PAUL SHIPMAN | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MONICA ELIZABETH HEARD | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
MARGARET SUSAN JACKSON | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
JUNE MARIAN MASKELL | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JANE MARGARET EVERETT | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ABBY WATTERSON | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
KAREN DIANE HOBDELL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
HELEN JOY ROBERTS | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
PAUL JOHNS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CHARLES RAYNER | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
CAROLE MORRIS | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
James Tristan Carver | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
STEPHEN NICHOLSON | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN McGREGOR STEVENSON HANCOCK | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ALAN JOHN WITHINGTON | Trustee | 18 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CHRIS MORREY | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|||||||
BEATRICE KATHLEEN MAYFIELD | Trustee | 21 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||
MARTIN JOHN BLYTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARGARET JOAN THURSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SANDRA GUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
YVONNE JOYCE SHORTEN BA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SHEILA BERYL CLARK MA, MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WILLIAM BRIAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MAVIS GIBSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JOHN DAVID HEARD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Rosemary Farrow | Trustee |
|
||||||||
BRIAN KEITH FARROW FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JANET CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAUL BRIAN CARVER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.50k | £302.87k | £297.52k | £276.35k | £285.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.50k | £262.42k | £282.58k | £279.57k | £296.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 07 July 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 24 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976)
Charitable objects
The purposes of the Methodist Church are and shall be deemed to have been since the date of union the advancement of - (a) the Christian faith in accordance with the doctrinal standards and the discipline of the Methodist Church; (b) any charitable purpose for the time being of any Connexional, district, circuit, local or other organisation of the Methodist Church; (c) any charitable purpose for the time being of any society or institution subsiduary or ancillary to the Methodist Church; (d) any purpose for the time being of any charity being a charity subsidiary or ancillary to the Methodist Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
119 MELTON ROAD
WEST BRIDGFORD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 6FG
- Phone:
- 01159331926
- Email:
- markroberts@cantab.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window